PRIOR PURSGLOVE COLLEGE
Charity number: 529507
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 01 January 1961: Standard registration
- 08 November 1993: Removed (Excepted charity)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- GUISBOROUGH GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 24 JUNE 1885 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 27 APRIL 1910, 6 MARCH 1912, 17 NOVEMBER 1933 AND ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT SEALED 14 JULY 1971.
Charitable objects
A DAY OR BOARDING SCHOOL FOR BOYS TO BE MAINTAINED IN OR NEAR THE URBAN DISTRICT OF GUISBOROUGH AND TO BE CONDUCTED AS A SECONDARY SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
URBAN DISTRICT OF GUISBOROUGH
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 JULY 1961
Charitable objects
AN EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 01 January 1961 : Standard registration
- 08 November 1993 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.