Linked charities SHARROW SCHOOL

Charity number: 529569
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 20TH JULY 1860.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL DISTRICT OF SHAROW
Registration history
  • 10 September 1965 : Standard registration
  • 09 September 2015 : Removed
  • 12 October 2015 : Re-registered
  • 09 September 2016 : Removed