HARROGATE LADIES' COLLEGE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Harrogate Ladies' College provides education to boys and girls in accordance with the principles of the Church of England. The business of the charity is entirely related to running schools known as Harrogate Ladies' College (girls only from 11 years to 18 years) and Highfield (co-educational from 2 years to 11 years) in Harrogate, North Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£9,782,340
Donations and legacies | £5.57k | |
Charitable activities | £9.54m | |
Other trading activities | £240.09k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £720 |
Total expenditure:
£9,852,527
Raising funds | £28.43k | |
Charitable activities | £9.82m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £28.43k | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.82m |
People

196 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 01 July 1964: Standard registration
- HARROGATE COLLEGE LIMITED (Previous name)
- HARROGATE LADIES COLLEGE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Francine Holroyd | Chair | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Abraham | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Hayley Kemp | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Christopher Matthew Balding | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
David Richard Payne Mr | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Lynne Renwick | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
GILES RICHARD BOWRING | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Ann Louise Chesworth | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Papworth | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Brooke Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|||||||||
John Marshall Edward Skinner | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.25m | £7.55m | £7.61m | £9.08m | £9.78m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.99m | £8.12m | £8.52m | £9.16m | £9.85m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.58k | £8.36k | £8.73k | £6.73k | £5.57k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £195.94k | £62.95k | £105.42k | £247.19k | £240.09k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.02m | £7.28m | £7.42m | £8.82m | £9.54m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £23.75k | £23.18k | £10.69k | £232 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £17.12k | £178.97k | £73.02k | £5.72k | £720 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.58k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.95m | £8.08m | £8.48m | £9.13m | £9.82m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £39.26k | £41.48k | £40.52k | £29.36k | £28.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.75k | £17.90k | £16.29k | £32.99k | £29.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £8.56k | £9.06k | £7.45k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.86m | £6.88m | £6.62m | £6.39m | £6.16m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.54m | £1.55m | £2 | £2 | £2 | |
|
Other assets | £2.67m | £1.33m | £3.56m | £4.04m | £3.95m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.33m | £2.62m | £3.87m | £4.19m | £3.95m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 1924 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 30 OCTOBER 1946, 25 SEPTEMBER 1951 AND 12 JUNE 1980 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 SEP 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 MAR 2016 as amended on 14 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
3 The objects for which the Company is established are: 3.1 The provision of schools for boys and girls at Harrogate in Yorkshire and/or if thought desirable of other schools in England and Wales, which shall provide education in accordance with the Protestant principles of the Church of England, and ancillary or incidental educational activities and associated activities for the benefit of the public 3.2 The support of the provision of education in accordance with the aforesaid principles at Colleges or Universities in England and Wales.
Area of benefit
HARROGATE
Linked charities
- 01 July 1964 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrogate Ladies College
Clarence Drive
Harrogate
HG1 2QG
- Phone:
- 01423504543
- Email:
- mrs.richards@hlc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window