MALTON SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to provide such benefits, of any kind not normally provided by the Local Education Authority, for Malton School, Malton, as agreed between the Charity's Governors and the Governors of the School, after consultation with the Local Authority. The income from the Endowment is available to be used in accordance with Clauses 15 and 16 of the Constitution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 18 April 1972: Standard registration
- MALTON SCHOOL ENDOWMENT (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN LEONARD PATTEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lauren Storm Bollons | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Anne Hawes | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Spencer | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Elaine Wilkin | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Smurthwaite | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Danielle Hargreaves | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOAN LAWRENCE | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
RODERICK ANSON | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE IRIS EVERETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CANON JOHN CHARLES MANCHESTER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.10k | £7.71k | £9.36k | £7.62k | £7.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.20k | £8.91k | £6.29k | £8.84k | £8.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 APRIL 1972 AND SCHEME OF 8 FEBRUARY 1979 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
1. NOT MORE THAN ONE-HALF OF THE YEARLY INCOME TO BE USED IN THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS, OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR MALTON SCHOOL, MALTON. 2. THE RESIDUE TO BE APPLIED IN AWARDING EXHIBITIONS AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE ETC. TO BENEFICIARIES. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME OF 18 APRIL 1972.
Area of benefit
CATCHEMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hardcastle France
30 Yorkersgate
MALTON
YO17 7AW
- Phone:
- 01653692107
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window