THE WELBURN HALL HOME-SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (IN CONNECTION WITH WELBURN HALL SCHOOL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association supports the education and welfare of pupils by fostering relationships with staff, parents and other associates of the school and engaging in activities which assist the pupils' education both in and out of the classroom. Fund raising events include the annual garden party, car boot sales, quizzes. Funds support theatre trips, keep fit/play equipment and larger projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 February 1971: Standard registration
- HOME-SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- WELBURN HALL HOME-SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhiann Askew | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Dobson | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Best | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.28k | £447 | £30.85k | £6.71k | £18.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.75k | £8.60k | £675 | £21.11k | £13.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 May 2025 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 7TH NOVEMBER 1970 as amended on 19 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
WELBURN HALL SCHOOL KIRBYMOORSIDE YORKS
Contact information
- Address:
-
KIRKBYMOORSIDE
NORTH YORKSHIRE
YO62 7HQ
- Phone:
- 01751431218
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window