Accounts and annual returns THE LEALHOLM SCHOOL

Charity number: 529688
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 28 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 22 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 13 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required