AINTHORPE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through the Management of Investments to provide ad hoc financial support to Students who are in full time education and resident in the Parish of Danby including the village of Westerdale in North Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 January 1965: Standard registration
- AINTHORPE CHARITY (Working name)
- FREE SCHOOL AT AINTHORPE (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE BARBER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Michael Anderson | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Sewell | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Wilson | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Blacklock | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
LIZ SMITH | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATE SMITH | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.78k | £8.63k | £10.43k | £12.08k | £10.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £4.95k | £4.20k | £4.17k | £4.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12TH MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 74C.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25,ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED A SCHOOL IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DANBY AND VILLAGE OF WESTERDALE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 ROBIN HOOD CLOSE
CASTLETON
WHITBY
YO21 2DH
- Phone:
- 01287660005
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window