YORK BUTCHERS' COMPANY CHARITABLE TRUST (INCORPORATING THE WILLIAM WRIGHT CHARITABLE TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meat & Livestock
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of York
Governance
- 24 September 1963: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 December 2009: Standard registration
- 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 August 2012: Re-registered
- THE YORK BUTCHERS COMPANY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH JANE TRUEMAN | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wright | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Clapham | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Smith | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard John Hampshire | Trustee | 13 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.13k | £3.46k | £5.20k | £4.16k | £5.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.72k | £0 | £2.00k | £1.00k | £16.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH JUNE 1963 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF APPRENTICES IN THE BUTCHERS TRADE AND ALLIED TRADES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROSPECT HOUSE
MAIN STREET
ELVINGTON
YORK
YO41 4AA
- Phone:
- 01904608155
- Email:
- clerk@yorkbutchersgild.co.uk
- Website:
-
yorkbutchersgild.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window