KIRTON-IN-LINDSEY EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Book Grants to students attending higher education (ie University). Students must live in the following parishes: Kirton in Lindsey,Blyborough, Grayingham, Hibaldstow, Manton, Northorpe, Redbourne, Scotter, Scotton and Waddingham. Students must also have attended one of the following Primary Schools for at least 2 years: Kirton in Lindsey, Scotter, Messingham, Waddingham or Hibaldstow
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 18 February 1965: Standard registration
- KIRTON IN LINDSEY EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Sharp | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Poole | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lilley | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL METHERINGHAM | Trustee | 08 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA HALMSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER WARWICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.63k | £5.45k | £4.21k | £7.08k | £4.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.78k | £3.94k | £4.25k | £4.07k | £4.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26TH OCTOBER 1910
Charitable objects
AWARDS OF JUNIOR AND SENIOR EXHIBITIONS. JUNIOR EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT SECONDARY SCHOOL OR AT ANY INSTITUTION OF TECHNICAL, PROFESSIONAL OR INDUSTRIAL INSTRUCTION. SENIOR EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR INSTITUTION OF TECHNICAL PROFESSIONAL OR INDUSTRIAL INSTRUCTION. (2) PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION IN SUBJECTS OF PRACTICAL OR A TECHNICAL NATURE. (3) AWARDING PAYMENTS TO CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA WHO HAVE ATTENDED A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS, FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONTINUING THEIR EDUCATION AND ATTENDING AT EVENING SCHOOLS, DAY OR EVENING CLASSES. (4) IN THE PROVISION OF BOOKS OR FITTINGS FOR A SCHOOL LIBRARY IN THE PARISH OF KIRTON IN LINDSEY FOR THE USE OF SCHOLARS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KIRTON IN LINDSEY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 South Cliff Road
Kirton Lindsey
GAINSBOROUGH
Lincolnshire
DN21 4DX
- Phone:
- 01652648817
- Email:
- bookgrantclerk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window