HAXEY ENDOWED SCHOOL ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was formed in 1849 with the aim to assist in the eduction/help for children of the Parish of Haxey. Yearly grants to organisations for children/young people are made. Children educated in the two schools in the Parish are presented with: Year 2 Children a Children's Bible and those Children leaving the Primary Schools at Year 6 a Rainbow Good News Bible at a School Leavers' Service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 29 November 1965: Standard registration
- HAXEY ENDOWED SCHOOL ESTATE (Working name)
- ENDOWED SCHOOL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN NICHOLAS COOPER Mr. | Chair | 17 June 1992 |
|
|
||||
Darren Leonard Skelton Mr | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Leslie Ian Thorpe Mr. | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Timothy Paul Zammitt | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Orton Mr. | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Eileen Patria Owers Mrs. | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Tully Mr. | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|||||
David William Knowles Mr. | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Lesley Booth Mrs. | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Simon Richard Andrew Mr. | Trustee | 18 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
Carol Lindley Mrs. | Trustee | 20 August 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.07k | £3.29k | £2.93k | £2.43k | £3.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.66k | £1.33k | £959 | £5.49k | £3.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6 MARCH 1868 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 22 AUGUST 1890 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN OF THE PARISH AND THE PROVISION OF PRIZES OR REWARDS FOR DESERVING PUPILS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HAXEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEVELS FARMHOUSE
DONCASTER ROAD
WESTWOODSIDE
DONCASTER
DN9 2EJ
- Phone:
- 07986570231
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window