HUMBERSTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 May 1964: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- HUMBERSTON SCHOOL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.95k | £1.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £307 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 07 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES DATED 26 MARCH 1878 AND 13 APRIL 1984
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN PROVIDING FOR HUMBERSTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE GOVERNORS OF THE SAID SCHOOL AND THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window