THE MATTHEW HUMBERSTONE COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL

Charity number: 529762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help with financial assistance and advice to pupils particularly those going to university

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £1,285
Total expenditure: £2,453

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • North East Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 July 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HEWITT TRUST (Working name)
  • KIRMAN TRUST (Working name)
  • THE MATHEW HUMBERSTONE COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David John Griffiths Trustee 10 April 2021
None on record
Judith Cripsey Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
Alan Williams Trustee 10 March 2014
None on record
RUTH ELSIE GOODWINS Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA MARY FORD Trustee
None on record
Keith Brookes Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.63k £3.70k £4.06k £2.40k £1.29k
Total expenditure £2.55k £2.26k £4.72k £1.16k £2.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT P.P.R. 11 SEPTEMBER 1930
Charitable objects
SCHOLARSHIP TO BE AWARDED TO SUCH STUDENTS AT THE SAID SCHOOL ENTERING EITHER OF THE UNIVERSITIES OF OXFORD OR CAMBRIDGE.FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE WILL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 22 July 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
150 Chichester Road
Cleethorpes
DN35 0JJ
Phone:
01472 235084
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available