TRAVIS'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial assistance to schools and individuals for the furtherance of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Doncaster
Governance
- 01 November 1967: Standard registration
- TRAVIS TRUST (Working name)
- TRAVIS TRUSTEES (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor David John Rose | Chair | 14 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev Christopher Boyd Bishop | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rosemary Elizabeth Brookes | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
GILLIAN MCGARVIE | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev Paul David Wilson | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
ANGELA WHITE | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.29k | £4.19k | £4.72k | £2.72k | £7.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.31k | £4.84k | £5.31k | £4.91k | £5.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19TH MAY 1966
Charitable objects
1. TO APPLY ANY PROCEEDS FROM THE SALE OF EXISTING PROPERTY TOWARDS BUILDING AND MAINTENANCE OF A NEW SCHOOL 2. TO APPLY ú15 AND ú10 ANNUALLY IN PROVIDING FOR TRAVIS PRIMARY SCHOOL AT THORNE AND TRAVIS CHARITY PRIMARY SCHOOL AT WROOT RESPECTIVELY. 3. TO MAKE PROVISION FOR EXHIBITIONS GRANTS AND OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION TO BE AWARDED TO YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF HATFIELD THORNE AND WROOT
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF HATFIELD, THORNE AND WROOT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Parish Office, 3 Vicarage Close
Hatfield
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN7 6HN
- Phone:
- 01302 350591
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window