THE PHILIP RECKITT EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary activity of the charity is the provision of grants to individuals and groups of individuals towards the costs of travel, residence and attendances at conferences, lectures and educational courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Norfolk
Governance
- 19 October 1970: Standard registration
- SIR PHILIP RECKITT EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Working name)
- SPRET (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence Michael Jones | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jane Margaret Warwick | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jeremy Neil Allison | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
ROBERT ALAN WALPOLE | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
GLYNIS WITHAM | Trustee | 10 June 2009 |
|
|
||||||||||
Philip James Harrison Holt FCA FCIE | Trustee | 09 May 2006 |
|
|
||||||||||
JOHN RICHARD LANE LLB AKC | Trustee | 01 December 2005 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.51k | £32.46k | £35.98k | £30.96k | £33.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.08k | £25.26k | £28.25k | £57.41k | £60.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND NOVEMBER 1944 AS MODIFIED BY SUPPLEMENTARY DEED DATED 21ST JULY 1949 AND BY HIGH COURT ORDER DATED 20TH APRIL 1970.
Charitable objects
EDUCATING AND ASSISTING IN THE EDUCATION OF ANY PERSONS FOR THE TIME BEING RESIDENT IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA OF THE EAST RIDING OF THE COUNTY OF YORK (INCLUDING THE CITY AND COUNTY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL) OR IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL COUNTY OF NORFOLK (INCLUDING THE CITY AND COUNT OF NORWICH) IN THE LANGUAGES, BUSINESS METHODS, SOCIAL SERVICES AND CUSTOMS OF ANY COUNTRY OR COUNTRIES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD OR IN ANY OTHER SUBJECT OR SUBJECTS OF STUDY.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rollits Llp
Forsyth House
Alpha Court
Monks Cross Drive
Huntington
YORK
- Phone:
- 01904 688506
- Email:
- john.lane@rollits.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window