WESLEYAN METHODIST SCHOOL

Charity Number: 529789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to individual children/young people, who have attended for not less than two years both a public elementary school in the Borough of Beverley and a Wesleyan Methodist School, for their further education/training.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £316
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 September 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Francesca Thea Rhys Chair 19 March 2022
None on record
Janet Birt Trustee 19 March 2022
None on record
CLAIRE BARNES Trustee
None on record
IAN CHRISTIE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £298 £300 £269 £281 £316
Total expenditure £400 £0 £0 £1.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Toll Gavel United Church
Toll Gavel
BEVERLEY
East Riding of Yorkshire
HU17 9AA
Phone:
01482880300
Website:

No information available