THE DICKINSON SCHOLARSHIP FUND ICW UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to eligible individuals to fund learning opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Manchester City
Governance
- 20 October 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Smith | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hazel McKay | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Winterbottom | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Nethercott | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Aitken | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DR AJIT KUMAR MAHAVEER | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SIMON CARLEY | Trustee | 05 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.08k | £13.72k | £13.65k | £21.53k | £17.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.56k | £0 | £0 | £16.20k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9TH NOVEMBER 1920 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 19TH FEBRUARY 1958
Charitable objects
(1) THE AWARD FROM TIME TO TIME OF A TRAVELLING RESEARCH SCHOLARSHIP IN MEDICINE TO GRADUATES OF ANY UNIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO HAVE DONE THEIR CLINICAL TRAINNING AS STUDENTS OF THE MANCHESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY. (2) THE AWARD OF AN ANNUAL PRIZE IN ANATOMY TO STUDENTS WHO ARE STUDYING FOR THEIR DEGREE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER AND IN THE UNITED MANCHESTER HOSPITALS. (3) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR GRANTS OF SUCH VALUE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT TO GRADUATES OF ANY UNIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO HAVE DONE THEIR CLINICAL TRAINING AS STUDENTS OF THE MANCHESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dept of Postgrad Medical Education
Postgraduate Centre
Manchester Royal Infirmary
Oxford Road
Manchester
M13 9WL
- Phone:
- 0161 276 8012
- Email:
- PGME.SAndW@mft.nhs.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window