ROBINSON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education for young people in the Howgill and Sedbergh area of Cumbria
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISTAIR MACKIE | Chair | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Peter Farragher | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Blenkinsop | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Marshall | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR ALLAN CAPSTICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE EDMUND CAPSTICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.97k | £15.26k | £15.56k | £4.00k | £27.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.52k | £13.67k | £12.80k | £675 | £32.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 30 OCTOBER 1963 AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE 13 JULY 1981
Charitable objects
PROVIDING SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS, BUSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SEDBERGH WITH A PREFERENCE TO PERSONS IN HOWGILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MILNE MOSER
100 HIGHGATE
KENDAL
LA9 4HE
- Phone:
- 01539729786
- Email:
- solicitors@milnemoser.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window