Governing document WAKEFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL ENDOWED LANDS TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 19 NOVEMBER 1591 AND SCHEME OF 23 JUNE 1891 AND 28 FEBRUARY 1989 AND SCHEME OF 24TH DECEMBER 1997 AND RESOLUTION OF 23 OCTOBER 1997, SCHEME DATED 3RD SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF WAKEFIELD OF A DAY SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND A DAY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS (HEREINAFTER TOGETHER REFERRED TO AS THE SCHOOLS). 2. TO PROVIDE BURSARIES TO BE CALLED STORIE BURSARIES, BEING TOTAL OR PARTIAL EXEMPTIONS FROM THE PAYMENT OF TUITION AND OTHER FEES TENABLE AT EITHER SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN WHO NEED FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND THE SCHOOL. 3. TO AWARD SCHOLARSHIPS AT EITHER SCHOOL TO CHILDREN SELECTED ON GROUNDS OF MERIT. 4. TO PROVIDE:(A) MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES FOR CHILDREN WHO NEED FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND EITHER SCHOOL., AND (B) ALLOWANCES FOR PUPILS WHO NEED FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MEET THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE COST OF EXTRA CURRICULAR ACTIVITIES UNDERTAKEN FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES. 5. TO MAKE AWARDS TO PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY FIVE WHO HAVING FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS AT ANY TIME ATTENDED EITHER SCHOOL, HAVE LEFT OR ARE ABOUT TO LEAVE IT AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 6. TO AWARD TO PUPILS AT EITHER SCHOOL PRIZES OR OTHER SUITABLE REWARDS OR MARKS OF DISTINCTION. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 4, 32-36 OF SCHEME OF 28 FEBRUARY 1989).
Area of benefit
IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF WAKEFIELD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.