THE MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manchester Grammar School is an independent boys school whose purpose is to educate boys who qualify by nature of their ability, regardless of family circumstances. Income from the school's foundation bursary fund, held by the MGS Trust, is used on a means tested basis to support boys from lower-income families who would not otherwise be able to accept a place at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£29,807,536
Donations and legacies | £3.25m | |
Charitable activities | £26.08m | |
Other trading activities | £25.08k | |
Investments | £454.73k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£28,188,654
Raising funds | £340.65k | |
Charitable activities | £27.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£289,844 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £340.65k | |
Charitable expenditure | £27.85m | |
Retained for future use | £1.62m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £340.65k | |
Charitable expenditure | £27.85m | |
Retained for future use | £1.91m |
People

326 Employee(s)
1 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 46 |
£70k to £80k | 6 |
£80k to £90k | 7 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- THE MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION TRUSTEE LIMITED | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.74m | £23.88m | £25.73m | £29.33m | £29.81m | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.58m | £23.24m | £24.47m | £25.85m | £28.19m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £450.64k | £301.46k | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.34m | £2.30m | £2.40m | £4.91m | £3.25m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £27.80k | £8.18k | £21.96k | £32.74k | £25.08k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £20.80m | £21.20m | £23.22m | £24.22m | £26.08m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £119.96k | £75.69k | £91.43k | £174.01k | £454.73k | |
|
Income - Other | £450.64k | £301.46k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.36m | £360.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £22.27m | £22.89m | £24.13m | £25.54m | £27.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £309.33k | £349.34k | £336.12k | £309.64k | £340.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £27.09k | £27.27k | £30.03k | £34.41k | £36.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £24.86k | £29.30k | £29.57k | £24.49k | £6.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £15.24m | £14.78m | £14.72m | £15.21m | £15.49m | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.00m | £6.27m | £5.60m | £5.46m | £5.78m | |
|
Other assets | £6.91m | £8.05m | £10.11m | £13.54m | £16.35m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.66m | -£298.74k | -£362.74k | -£666.74k | -£1.54m | |
|
Total liabilities | £8.56m | £8.81m | £9.74m | £10.42m | £12.17m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31/07/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY OR DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF MANCHESTER
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER
Linked charities
- ASHER AND BEN HYMAN MEMORIAL GRANTS
- CHARLES FREDERICK BEYER BEQUEST
- DUCHESS OF SOMERSET'S SCHOLARSHIP
- FRANK ROBY SWIMMING FUND
- FRANKLIN SCHOLARSHIP
- GEORGE AND MARY BRUMWELL SCHOLARSHIP
- GEORGE W HEDLEY BURSARY
- HAROLD WILLIAMSON MEMORIAL FUND
- JOHN WILLIAM HODKINSON FUND
- L J H BRADLEY BEQUEST (LIBRARY)
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL BURSARY FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL BURSARY FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL EDUCATION TRAVEL FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL EDUCATION TRAVEL FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL GENERAL FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL GENERAL FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL GENERAL FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL LEAVING EXHIBITION FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL LIBRARY FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL PRIZE FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL PRIZE FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL SPORTS/GAMES ASSISTANCE FUND
- NATHAN LASKI GAMES FUND
- OLIVER HEYWOOD FOUNDATION
- OWEN W COX CLOCK MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR FUND
- R BRONNERT MEMORIAL FUND
- RICHARD M R DEHN SCHOLARSHIPS FUND
- SHAKESPEARE SCHOLARSHIPS
- SPORTS FUND
- T F NUTTER MEMORIAL FUND
- THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE HORSLEY SCHOLARSHIPS
- THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE HOWARD SCHOLARSHIPS
- THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE LANGWORTHY SCHOLARSHIPS
- THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE LOB MEMORIAL FUND
- THE EARL OF WOOLTON PRIZE
- THE EDEN PRIZES OR SCHOLARSHIPS
- THE GRAMMAR SCHOOL SCHOLARSHIPS
- THE LEAVING EXHIBITION FUND
- THOMAS STANLEY ROGERS SCHOLARSHIP
- TWENTYMAN SCHOLARSHIP
- V G FUNDUKLIAN RUGBY FOOTBALL FUND
- W H ROBERTS SCHOLARSHIPS
- W SUMMERFIELD BEQUEST
- 30 March 1966 : Standard registration
- 23 October 2001 : Removed
- 23 October 2001 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANCHESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL
OLD HALL LANE
MANCHESTER
M13 0XT
- Phone:
- 01612247201
- Email:
- general@mgs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window