DRONFIELD HENRY FANSHAWE SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
None
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 15 September 1966: Standard registration
- 22 May 2014: Funds received from 507456 THE LATE JANMEJOY MITRA FUND
- HENRY FANSHAWE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- DRONFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Welton | Chair | 23 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Karim Sorefan | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Jones | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jones | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Spooner | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Kenyon | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Terence Ernest Rogers | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Kenneth Reaney | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Kenyon | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Foster | Trustee | 04 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Alex Dale | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.87k | £8.32k | £10.95k | £11.34k | £10.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.74k | £13.56k | £15.74k | £1.46k | £22.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17 MAY 1888 AS ALTERED BY SCHEME DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1909 AND ARTICLES AND GOVERNMENT DATED 28 AUGUST 1950,AND RESOLUTIONS PASSED 8 MAY 2007 AND 20 MAY 2014 as amended on 03 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN A DAY OR BOARDING SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND A DAY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS IN OR NEAR THE URBAN DISTRICT OF DRONFIELD.
Area of benefit
DRONFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Longcroft Road
Dronfield Woodhouse
DRONFIELD
Derbyshire
S18 8XU
- Phone:
- 07791114459
- Email:
- dhfsfoundation@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window