Trustees HIGHFIELD PRIORY SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 532262
Up to date (44 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne-Marie Flynn | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Hayhurst | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Southworth | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Philip Noall | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shona Moylon | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA MASON ACA | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN ROBERT HALL | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ALICIA TEAGUE NAIRN | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
EMAN MOHAMED SAMI AHMED | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DARREN WHITMAN | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.