THE BIBA NORTH WEST AREA PRIZE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of prizes for candidates sitting examinations of the Chartered Insurance Institute within the area administered by the British Insurance Brokers Association, Greater Manchester & West Pennine Region. Such prizes to be awarded to the candidates attaining the most meritorious record in completing the said examinations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Bolton
- Bury
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Warrington
Governance
- 09 May 1974: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 June 2015: Re-registered
- THE CORPORATION OF INSURANCE BROKERS (NORTH WEST AREA) PRIZE SCHEME (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Carlon | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Evans | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Miotk | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £350 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 November 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 06 MAR 1974 AS AMENDED ON 10 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRIZE FUND ARE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF INSURANCE BROKING FOR BOTH YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS IN GREATER MANCHESTER AND WEST PENNINE REGION BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, BURSARIES OR OTHER FINANCIAL AWARDS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Sunningdale Drive
SALFORD
M6 7PH
- Phone:
- 01616872112
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window