WOLSTANTON HIGH SCHOOL PRIZES FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WOLSTANTON HIGH SCHOOL - SCHOOL PRIZE FUND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 18 September 1974: Standard registration
- 21 August 1998: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH MARSHLANDS HIGH SCHOOL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220 | £221 | £224 | £226 | £231 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 20 May 2016 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 17 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF MR FREDERICK HAZLEHURST DATE 2/12/1934 AS AMENDED BY S 74 RESOLUTION DATED 26/3/97 AND AMENDED BY S74 RESOLUTION DATED 26/11/97 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION UNDER SECTION 74 DATED 17/2/1998
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- B J BROWNING MEDICINE PRIZE FUND
- DR AND MRS W E ATKINS GEOLOGY PRIZE
- HAZLEHURST SCHOLARSHIPS
- THE ALDERMAN DENIS PROCTOR MEMORIAL PRIZE
- THE ALDERMAN F A DALE ENDOWED MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- THE CAPTAIN G C DESANGES PRIZE FUND
- THE DAVID CHADWICK MEMORIAL CUP
- THE DR L W HOLDSWORTH PRIZE FUND
- THE FRANK SUTTON PRIZE FUND
- THE H G LANE MEMORIAL FUND
- THE JOHN DIMELOW ENGINEERING PRIZE
- THE LEIGHTON PRIZE FOR ENGLISH LANGUAGE
- THE STANIER PRIZES FUND
- THE T F RUTTER MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- THE WILLIAM BULLOUGH PRIZE FUND
- 18 September 1974 : Standard registration
- 21 August 1998 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window