Financial history ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF EXHALL GRANGE SCHOOL

Charity number: 532325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £458 £31 £30 £274 £10.57k
Total expenditure £20 £331 £158 £0 £217
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A