ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF EXHALL GRANGE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enhanced support for children with Special Needs & Disabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 September 1974: Standard registration
- A F E G S (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Seickell | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Bosworth | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £458 | £31 | £30 | £274 | £10.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20 | £331 | £158 | £0 | £217 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 7 AUGUST 1974 AS AMENDED 27 FEBRUARY 1983 AND 16 SEPTEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE HANDICAPPED PUPILS PRESENT AND PAST OF EXHALL GRANGE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THEIR GENERAL WELFARE, LEISURE, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Exhall Grange Specialist School
Easter Way
COVENTRY
CV7 9HP
- Phone:
- 02476364200
- Email:
- info@exhallgrange.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window