PARKLAND PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Basic fund raising school oriented events. Specific examples in 2013 are Christmas Fete, Summer Fete, School Disco, Move-a-thon, cake/ice cream sales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 27 June 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Rengozzi | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Thomas | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.55k | £22.99k | £12.62k | £5.19k | £4.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.62k | £4.66k | £23.50k | £2.98k | £11.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 December 2020 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MARCH 1975 AS AMENDED 26/09/1984,09/10/1985,06/10/1988 AND 28/09/1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2(A&B) OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
PARKLAND INFANTS AND JUNIOR SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parkland County Primary School
Sketty Park Drive
Sketty
Swansea
SA2 8NG
- Phone:
- 01792205462
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window