Trustees TERRINGTON HALL TRUST LIMITED
Charity Number: 532362

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Lamont | Chair | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Blair Mutton | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Willoughby | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Simms | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Moore | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Griffiths | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gretchen Eaton | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Collins | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Coluhoun | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hogg | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Anne Bannister | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY LAWRENCE CORDINGLEY | Trustee | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.