Register of Charities - The Charity Commission JAMES MOUL'S CHARITY
Charity number: 210118-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF THE 24TH JUNE 1862 AND 24TH OCTOBER 1916 AND VARYING SCHEME OF THE 4TH APRIL 1963
Charitable objects
1) 29/35 OF INCOME TO BE PAID HALF-YEARLY TO THE MINISTER OR PASTOR OF THE HIGH STREET BAPTIST CHAPEL IN SAFFRON WALDEN 2) 6/35 TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR MEMBERS OF THE CONGREGATION OF THE SAID CHAPEL IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
SAFFRON WALDEN AND DISTRICT
Registration history
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 27 October 1995: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.