Register of Charities - The Charity Commission SHARE OF ALICE HEMINGE CHARITY(CHURCH BRANCH)
Charity number: 211034-3
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF THE 24TH JULY 1896,25TH JULY 1905,3 JULY 1936 AND 31 MARCH 1965
Charitable objects
PAYMENT TO THE RECTOR FOR PREACHING OF A SERMON ON NOT LESS THAN TEN SUNDAYS IN EACH YEAR.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ORSETT
Registration history
- 25 September 1962: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.