Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE LORD'S LAND

Charity number: 211584-5
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 5 FEBRUARY 1884 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 29 OCTOBER 1964 AND 24 NOVEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF POOR OF THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BLACKMORE
Registration history
  • 20 December 1962: Standard registration
  • 18 January 2005: Removed (Registered in error)
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of