NEWBRIDGE ON WYE COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a venue for the benefit of the entire community, in order for them to fulfil their sporting,social and adult educational needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 11 April 1988: Standard registration
- NEWBRIDGE-ON-WYE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEWBRIDGE-ON-WYE COMMUNITY HALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.71k | £9.42k | £9.86k | £7.90k | £33.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.05k | £10.08k | £8.90k | £9.94k | £13.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 15 APRIL 1987
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF LLANYRE IN TH COUNTY OF POWYS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF LLANYRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
DINGLE VIEW
FRANKSBRIDGE
LLANDRINDOD WELLS
LD1 5SA
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window