Trustees RADFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity Number: 700030

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary O'Connell | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shannon Prew | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shiraaz Ismail | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Skipper | Trustee | 27 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Martin | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Kindness | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.