HOLMES CHAPEL AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performance of musical works for cultural enhancement of community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 26 May 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liam Tyler Murphy | Trustee | 02 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John James Oliver | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Iles | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Best | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stuart Cotton | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Philip Atherton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN JOHN TOTHILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.19k | £214 | £8.42k | £11.36k | £11.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.98k | £1.78k | £9.66k | £11.93k | £11.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 June 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 22 MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL ARTS; TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS; TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 EASTGATE ROAD
HOLMES CHAPEL
CREWE
CW4 7BW
- Phone:
- 01477537438
- Email:
- Philipather@aol.com
- Website:
-
holmeschapelsingers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window