Accounts and annual returns HINDU CULTURAL SOCIETY OF CLEVELAND

Charity number: 700067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 April 2022 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 April 2022 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 May 2021 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 May 2021 107 days late Download Open in new window