EQUALITY TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OFFERS FREE AND IMPARTIAL ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO DISABLED PEOPLE, THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES IN THE BRADFORD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT ON BENEFITS, EQUIPMENT,PARKING, TRANSPORT, EMPLOYMENT, EDUCATION,LEISURE, HOUSING AND HOLIDAYS. PROVIDES SHORT-TERM WHEELCHAIR AND DISABILITY EQUIPMENT HIRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,448,201
Donations and legacies | £102.03k | |
Charitable activities | £1.29m | |
Other trading activities | £55.26k | |
Investments | £282 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,511,743
Raising funds | £36.49k | |
Charitable activities | £1.48m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £704,698 from 8 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £36.49k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.48m |
People

33 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 April 1988: Standard registration
- 08 September 2015: Funds received from 1114662 CONTACT PEER SUPPORT SERVICE (BRADFORD AND DISTRIC...
- 25 January 2016: Funds received from 1096166 BRADFORD ALLIANCE ON COMMUNITY CARE LIMITED
- 19 August 2022: Funds received from 1163627 SING FROM THE HEART
- 18 July 2023: Funds received from 509020 SCOPE IN BRADFORD
- BRADFORD DISABILITY SERVICES LTD (Working name)
- DISABILITY ADVICE BRADFORD (Working name)
- DISABILITY EQUIPMENT BRADFORD (Working name)
- BRADFORD DISABILITY SERVICES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Crowe | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohinder Singh Chana | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Jenny Scott | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Asquith | Trustee | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alvin Adey | Trustee | 03 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £656.64k | £846.14k | £990.34k | £1.29m | £1.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £653.88k | £859.77k | £1.01m | £1.19m | £1.51m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £565.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £674.08k | £698.59k | £754.79k | £704.70k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £26.07k | £56.79k | £71.62k | £220.38k | £102.03k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.98k | £875 | £33.35k | £56.39k | £55.26k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £608.19k | £787.98k | £885.36k | £1.01m | £1.29m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £534 | £0 | £0 | £54 | £282 | |
|
Income - Other | £9.86k | £486 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £653.88k | £859.77k | £997.78k | £1.15m | £1.48m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £10.56k | £39.28k | £36.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £26.33k | £0 | £7.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.89k | £20.45k | £62.52k | £101.35k | £175.79k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £130.58k | £227.62k | £143.36k | £242.50k | £107.58k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £59.04k | £183.28k | £159.09k | £200.02k | £203.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/02/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 1.1 TO PROVIDE THE RELIEF OF ALL PEOPLE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY, AGE, INFIRMITY, SICKNESS, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, CARING RESPONSIBILITIES, OR WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FOR OTHER REASONS, FACE BARRIERS TO ACCESSING, OR HAVE A NEED OF, HEALTH, SOCIAL CARE OR OTHER RELATED COMMUNITY SERVICES; AND 1.2 TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND TRAINING, WHICH WILL ENABLE SUCH PEOPLE TO: 1.2.1 RESPOND TO ISSUES OF CONCERN AND INTEREST RELATED TO THEIR CARE 1.2.2 HELP THEM TO MEET THEIR NEEDS; AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY AND MORE SPECIFICALLY WITHIN THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Equality Together
Manningham Mills Community Centre
The Silk Warehouse
Lilycroft Road
Bradford
BD9 5BD
- Phone:
- 01274594173
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window