T L F SPORTS CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disabled Sports
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Northumberland
Governance
- 15 April 1988: Standard registration
- 07 June 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- T L F (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.48k | £482 | £554 | £123 | £15 | |
|
Total expenditure | £361 | £587 | £950 | £98 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 17 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 08 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 10 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 20 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 21 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JULY 1987 AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL REACTION AND SPORT FOR PERSONS HAVING A PHYSICAL, SENSORY OR MENTAL DISABILITY IN THE BLYTH AREA, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
BLYTH AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window