Trustees WIRRELDERLY
Charity Number: 700121
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lawson Stebbings | Chair | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Rourke | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aled Butterfield Cadwallader | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olusola Faluyi | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Patricia Robinson | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arthur Paddock | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Sean Kirkby | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Jenkin | Trustee | 08 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Duckworth | Trustee | 22 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.