Accounts and annual returns BURNLEY PLAY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 700153
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 02 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 01 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 19 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 25 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 14 March 2006 42 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 11 April 2005 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 11 March 2005 39 days late