Accounts and annual returns DUKERIES COMPLEX TOY LIBRARY

Charity number: 700178
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 07 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2009 12 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2008 16 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 14 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 07 July 2008 On Time