Financial history DUKERIES COMPLEX TOY LIBRARY

Charity number: 700178
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010
Total gross income £35.89k £11.24k £5.28k £4.79k £7.06k
Total expenditure £30.04k £6.27k £1.85k £3.48k £2.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A