DUKERIES COMPLEX TOY LIBRARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide access to toys and equipment for loan ( for a small charge),to families and groups to support young children with and without disabilities. We organise 4 play and lending sessions per week during term time. To maintain and extend toys and equipment in the Toy Library to meet children's individual needs.Liase with other professionals and voluntary organisations involved with under fives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 28 April 1988: Standard registration
- 12 July 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.89k | £11.24k | £5.28k | £4.79k | £7.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.04k | £6.27k | £1.85k | £3.48k | £2.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 07 July 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 12 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 16 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 14 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 07 July 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN, FOR THEIR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION SUCH AS THERAPEUTIC, EDUCATIONAL OR STIMULATING TOYS, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJEC OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. I) TO ASSIST THE DEVELOPMENT FROM THE EARLIEST AGE OF ALL LOCAL HANDICAPPED CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR DISABILITY THROUGH ALL FORMSOF PLAY ACTIVITY. II) TO LEND CHILDREN THE BEST AVAILABLE TOYS. III) TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY FOR PROFESSIONAL INVOLVEMET IN A VOLUNTARY SERVICE FOR LOCAL CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window