Financial history ELLENROAD TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 700197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £76.76k £70.45k £71.98k £44.62k £36.08k
Total expenditure £53.68k £62.56k £113.75k £39.99k £40.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.95k £34.56k N/A £21.73k £29.83k