Trustees ELLENROAD TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 700197

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IRENE DAVIDSON | Chair | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Wilcock | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Gordon Potts | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Thomas Besford | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Bamford | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Andy Kelly | Trustee | 21 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Pilling Bsc | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|||||
David Pope | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP YATES | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JAMES ARNFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.