Governing document THE WIGAN AND LEIGH COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF WIGAN AND ITS ENVIRONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE “AREA OF BENEFIT”) AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WIGAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.