Linden Road Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hire of Hall, Bingo, Meetings, entertainment. The Hall is used by Keep fit, Dancing, Whist Drives, There is a stage for amateur dramatics. Once a year as a polling station, Craft Fairs, Wedding, Birthday, Anniversary Parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 11 May 1988: Standard registration
- EARBY AND KELBROOK SENIOR CITIZENS CENTRE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND GLASGOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH CARROLL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.26k | £13.00k | £2.63k | £5.10k | £8.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.71k | £4.35k | £4.44k | £5.80k | £7.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JANUARY 1988 AS AMENDED 12 MARCH 1988 as amended on 26 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
EARBY, COLNE, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
linden road
earby
barnoldswick
Lancashire
BB18 6XR
- Phone:
- 0785 4683 357
- Email:
- rosemary@carro-step.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window