Financial history FRIENDS OF TAN-Y-CASTELL SCHOOL CYFEILLION YSGOL TAN-Y-CASTELL

Charity Number: 700267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/10/2020 06/10/2021 06/10/2022 06/10/2023 06/10/2024
Total gross income £3.18k £1.13k £3.83k £6.03k £3.74k
Total expenditure £955 £1.29k £666 £2.73k £7.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A