FRIENDS OF TAN-Y-CASTELL SCHOOL CYFEILLION YSGOL TAN-Y-CASTELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for equipment and activities for pupils at TanyCastell Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 October 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 26 May 1988: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF TAN-Y-CASTELL SCHOOL CVFEILLION YSSD TAN-Y-CASTELL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gail Louise Roberts | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/10/2020 | 06/10/2021 | 06/10/2022 | 06/10/2023 | 06/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.18k | £1.13k | £3.83k | £6.03k | £3.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £955 | £1.29k | £666 | £2.73k | £7.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 October 2024 | 19 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2023 | 19 April 2025 | 256 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2022 | 19 April 2025 | 622 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2021 | 19 April 2025 | 987 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 14 MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY: (A) DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. (C) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O YSGOL TANYCASTELL
HARLECH
GWYNEDD
LL46 2SW
- Phone:
- 01766780454
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window