THE FIVE VILLAGES (GAMSTON) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Gamston & the surrounding area without distinction of political, religious or other opinions by associating with the said inhabitants in a common effort to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation & leisure time with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gamston with West Drayton and Eaton Parish Council | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £875 | £625 | £12 | £500 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £875 | £0 | £0 | £49 | £144 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 APRIL 1988 AND A SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 14TH MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 2005 as amended on 09 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GAMSTON WITH WEST DRAYTON AND EATON IN THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ACCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GAMSTON WITH WEST DRAYTON AND EATON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Main Street
Hayton
RETFORD
Nottinghamshire
DN22 9LL
- Phone:
- 01777 705552
- Email:
- clerk.gamston@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window