THE GREATER MANCHESTER POLICE MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The GMPMVC gives concerts throughout the UK but mainly within the GMP area. By invitation, it has also sung in the EU. The Choir has been privileged to assist in raising many thousands of pounds for organisations and charities such as Scope, The Rainbow Trust, The Deep Sea Fishermen's Mission, Rochdale Springhill & Bury Hospices, Cancer Research UK as well as local churches and schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 21 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Barrie Hughes | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Sweeney | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Norman Pearce | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP PORTER | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Martin | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eric Walford | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Francis George Pearson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.73k | £14.77k | £7.43k | £3.62k | £3.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.58k | £2.60k | £9.14k | £7.75k | £7.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 28 MAY 1974 AD AMENDED 26 FEBRUARY 1987 RULES AS AMENDED ON 05/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/2015 as amended on 24 Oct 2019 as amended on 26 Nov 2020 as amended on 06 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
A)TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC. B)TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE CONSTABULARY THROUGH GREATER CONTACT WITH THE PUBLIC. C)TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 BEECHFIELD ROAD
MILNROW
ROCHDALE
OL16 4EU
- Phone:
- 01706359614
- Email:
- fpgmpmvc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window