Accounts and annual returns YORK ALCOHOL ADVICE SERVICE

Charity number: 700394
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 01 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 01 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 18 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 18 October 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 11 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 11 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 01 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 01 September 2008 On Time